WI SB55 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 38.12 (4), 59.14 (2), 61.32, 62.11 (4) (a), 64.34 (1) and 120.11 (4); to amend 985.05 (1); and to create 38.12 (4) (b), 59.14 (2) (b), 61.32 (2), 62.11 (4) (a) 2., 64.34 (1) (b) and 120.11 (4) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: publication of proceedings of meetings held by certain governmental bodies.
Title
Publication of proceedings of meetings held by certain governmental bodies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-12-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Local Government |
2021-03-03 | House | Representative Kurtz withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2021-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-16-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Introduced |