WI SB546 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Published 4-20-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Published 4-20-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 46.07, 301.32 (1), 302.13 and 303.01 (8) (b); and to create 20.455 (2) (gj), 165.505, 303.01 (8) (c) 7r., 303.065 (5) (ck), 814.75 (7m), 814.76 (5m) and 973.0425 of the statutes; Relating to: administrative subpoena for investigating Internet crimes against children, creating an Internet crimes against children surcharge, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Administrative subpoena for investigating Internet crimes against children, creating an Internet crimes against children surcharge, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-19 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Published 4-20-2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-19-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 369 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-18-2016 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 2) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Assembly Amendment 2 concurred in |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-15-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Representative Hintz added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Representative Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Representative Stuck added as a cosponsor |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 87, Noes 7, Paired 2 |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Jarchow and Goyke |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 74, Noes 20 |
2016-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kessler |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-18 | House | Representatives Barca, Shankland, Wachs, Zepnick, Sargent, Ohnstad and Hesselbein added as cosponsors |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:37 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-16 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 3 by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Lasee and Wanggaard |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Introduced |