WI SB54 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 302.113 (8m) (a), 302.114 (8m) (a), 304.06 (3) and 973.10 (2) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: recommendation to revoke parole, probation, and extended supervision if a person is charged with a crime.
Title
Recommendation to revoke parole, probation, and extended supervision if a person is charged with a crime.
Sponsors
Sen. Leah Vukmir [R] | Sen. David Craig [R] | Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] |
Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] | Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] |
Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Cindi Duchow [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] |
Rep. Bob Gannon [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Jim Ott [R] | Rep. Jesse Kremer [R] |
Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Senate - Senate: Refused to refer to joint review committee on Criminal Penalties (Y: 13 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-11-07 - Senate - Senate: Refused to refer to joint committee on Finance (Y: 13 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Senate - Senate: Refused to refer to joint review committee on Criminal Penalties (Y: 13 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-11-07 - Senate - Senate: Refused to refer to joint committee on Finance (Y: 13 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 2) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 59, Noes 35 |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Sanfelippo, Born, Nygren, Vos, Jacque, Tittl, Schraa, Vorpagel, Zimmerman, Spiros, Krug, Summerfield, Steffen and Knodl |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 36 |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Goyke, Bowen, Brostoff, Considine, Genrich, Hebl, Hesselbein, Kessler, Pope, Subeck, Vruwink, Young and Zamarripa |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 35 |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Goyke, Barca, Berceau, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Considine, Doyle, Fields, Hebl, Hesselbein, Kessler, Kolste, Meyers, Neubauer, Pope, Shankland, Spreitzer, Vruwink, Young and Zamarripa |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Goyke, Barca, Berceau, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Considine, Doyle, Fields, Hebl, Hesselbein, Kolste, Meyers, Neubauer, Pope, Shankland, Spreitzer, Vruwink, Young, Zamarripa and Kessler |
2018-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:40 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27 |
2018-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and referred to committee on Rules pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2017-11-14 | House | Read first time and referred to joint committee on Finance |
2017-11-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Refused to refer to joint review committee on Criminal Penalties, Ayes 13, Noes 20 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Refused to refer to joint committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 20 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Point of order that the bill is not properly before the Senate is not well taken |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Vukmir |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |