WI SB54 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-7)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Published 7-11-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 961.14 (4) (intro.), 961.14 (4) (x), 961.14 (7) (intro.), 961.41 (1) (e) (intro.), 961.41 (1m) (e) (intro.) and 961.41 (3g) (d); and to create 59.54 (25g), 66.0107 (1) (bn), 961.14 (4) (tb), 961.14 (4) (te), 961.14 (4) (th), 961.14 (4) (tL), 961.14 (4) (tp), 961.14 (4) (tr), 961.14 (4) (tu), 961.14 (4) (ty), 961.14 (4) (wgm), 961.14 (7) (m), 961.14 (7) (n) and 961.41 (3g) (em) of the statutes; relating to: certain controlled substances and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certain controlled substances and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-07SenatePublished 7-11-2011
2011-06-27SenateReport approved by the Governor on 6-24-2011. 2011 Wisconsin Act 31
2011-06-22SenatePresented to the Governor on 6-22-2011
2011-06-13SenateReport correctly enrolled on 6-13-2011
2011-06-08SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2011-06-08HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2011-06-08HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2011-06-08HouseRules suspended
2011-06-08HouseOrdered to a third reading
2011-06-08HouseRead a second time
2011-06-08HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2011-06-02HousePlaced on calendar 6-8-2011 by committee on Rules
2011-05-17HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2011-05-17HouseReceived from Senate
2011-05-17SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2011-05-17SenateRead a third time and passed
2011-05-17SenateRules suspended
2011-05-17SenateOrdered to a third reading
2011-05-17SenateRead a second time
2011-05-16SenatePlaced on calendar 5-17-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2011-05-12SenateAvailable for scheduling
2011-05-12SenateReport passage recommended by committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2011-05-11SenateExecutive action taken
2011-05-05SenateSenator Kedzie added as a coauthor
2011-05-03SenatePublic hearing held
2011-05-03SenateFiscal estimate received
2011-04-15SenateFiscal estimate received
2011-04-15SenateFiscal estimate received
2011-04-08SenateFiscal estimate received
2011-04-04SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations
2011-04-04SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback