WI SB536 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 100.45 (5) (a) 2., 100.45 (5) (c) and 100.45 (5m); and to amend 20.115 (1) (hm), 100.45 (3) (b) 2., 100.45 (3) (c) 4., 100.45 (4) (d) and 100.45 (4) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: the regulation of motor vehicle air conditioners. (FE)
Title
The regulation of motor vehicle air conditioners. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Energy, Consumer Protection, and Government Reform, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Representative Jacque added as a cosponsor |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Energy, Consumer Protection, and Government Reform |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb536 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB536.pdf |