WI SB536 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Published 4-23-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 939.74 (2) (d); to amend 48.415 (9m) (title), 939.74 (2) (c), 939.74 (2d) (c), 948.12 (1m), 949.03 (1) (b), 968.28 and 972.11 (2) (b) (intro.); and to create 48.415 (9m) (am) of the statutes; relating to: prosecution time limits for the offense of trafficking a child, possession of child pornography, termination of parental rights after committing the offense of trafficking a child, criminal procedure, crime victim compensation, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prosecution time limits for the offense of trafficking a child, possession of child pornography, termination of parental rights after committing the offense of trafficking a child, criminal procedure, crime victim compensation, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-12SenatePublished 4-23-2012
2012-04-10SenateReport approved by the Governor on 4-9-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 271
2012-04-05SenatePresented to the Governor on 4-5-2012
2012-03-21SenateReport correctly enrolled on 3-21-2012
2012-03-19SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2012-03-15HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2012-03-15HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2012-03-15HouseRules suspended
2012-03-15HouseOrdered to a third reading
2012-03-15HouseRead a second time
2012-03-13HouseMade a special order of business at 9:31 A.M. on 3-14-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 24
2012-03-13HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2012-03-13HouseReceived from Senate
2012-03-13SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2012-03-13SenateRead a third time and passed
2012-03-13SenateRules suspended
2012-03-13SenateOrdered to a third reading
2012-03-13SenateRead a second time
2012-03-13SenateSenator Carpenter added as a coauthor
2012-03-13SenatePlaced at the foot of the calendar of 03-13-2012
2012-03-13SenateRules suspended and taken up
2012-03-12SenatePlaced on calendar 3-13-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2012-03-12SenateAvailable for scheduling
2012-03-12SenateReport passage recommended by committee on Labor, Public Safety, and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2012-03-09SenateExecutive action taken
2012-03-09SenateSenator Schultz added as a coauthor
2012-03-09SenateFiscal estimate received
2012-03-09SenateFiscal estimate received
2012-03-08SenatePublic hearing held
2012-03-07SenateFiscal estimate received
2012-03-01SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Labor, Public Safety, and Urban Affairs
2012-03-01SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback