WI SB534 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 101.12 (3) (br); and to create 101.01 (1g), 101.12 (3) (bg), 101.12 (3) (bw), 101.12 (3g), 101.12 (3o) and 145.02 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: building and plumbing plan review and variances by cities, villages, towns, and counties for public buildings and places of employment and affecting related rules of the Department of Safety and Professional Services.
Title
Building and plumbing plan review and variances by cities, villages, towns, and counties for public buildings and places of employment and affecting related rules of the Department of Safety and Professional Services.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Sen. Rob Hutton [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Laid on table |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Representative Spiros added as a cosponsor |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development, Commerce and Local Government |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb534 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB534.pdf |