WI SB533 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Published 4-26-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Published 4-26-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 6.34 (3) (a) 3.; and to create 66.0438 of the statutes; Relating to: regulating the production and use of photo identification cards by local units of government. (FE)
Title
Regulating the production and use of photo identification cards by local units of government. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Senate | Published 4-26-2016 |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-25-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 374 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-21-2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 62, Noes 35, Paired 2 |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2016-02-16 | House | Read |
2016-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senators Carpenter, L. Taylor and C. Larson |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Miller, Risser, Shilling, Lassa, Wirch, Carpenter, L. Taylor, C. Larson, Ringhand and Bewley |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections and Local Government |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Introduced |