WI SB53 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Fiscal estimate received
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 60.555, 118.07 (4) (bm) 2. and 118.07 (4) (c); and to create 101.14 (1) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: installation of a barricade device on an interior door in a school building. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Installation of a barricade device on an interior door in a school building. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-03-14SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-03-13SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-03-11SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-02-26SenateSenator Craig added as a coauthor
2019-02-25SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2019-02-25SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback