WI SB53 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.625 (1) (g), 950.04 (1v) (g), 973.015 (1m) (a) 1. and 973.015 (1m) (b); and to create 973.015 (1m) (a) 3. c. and 973.015 (1m) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: expungement of certain offenses committed before the age of 25 and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Expungement of certain offenses committed before the age of 25 and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Leah Vukmir [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Alberta Darling [R] | Sen. Sheila Harsdorf [R] |
Sen. Chris Kapenga [R] | Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Sen. Fred Risser [D] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Cindi Duchow [R] |
Rep. Bob Gannon [R] | Rep. Mark Born [R] | Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] | Rep. James Edming [R] |
Rep. Jim Ott [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] |
Rep. Jason Fields [D] | Rep. Chris Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Representative Petryk added as a cosponsor |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-21 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 95, Noes 0 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-21 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-02-21 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen |
2018-02-15 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:18 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 |
2017-11-14 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-11-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 2 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Senator Craig added as a coauthor |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 2 by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Vukmir |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |