WI SB53 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 36.27 (3n) (bm) 2., 36.27 (3p) (bm) 2., 38.24 (7) (bm) 2., 38.24 (8) (bm) 2. and 39.50 (3m); to renumber 36.27 (3n) (bm) 1., 36.27 (3p) (bm) 1., 38.24 (7) (bm) 1. and 38.24 (8) (bm) 1.; and to amend 20.235 (1) (fz), 36.27 (3n) (b) (intro.), 36.27 (3n) (bg), 36.27 (3n) (c), 36.27 (3p) (b), 36.27 (3p) (c), 38.24 (7) (b) (intro.), 38.24 (7) (bg), 38.24 (7) (c), 38.24 (8) (b), 38.24 (8) (c), 39.50 (1), 39.50 (2) and 39.50 (4) of the statutes; relating to: remission of fees for veterans and their dependents enrolled in the University of Wisconsin System or in a technical college and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Remission of fees for veterans and their dependents enrolled in the University of Wisconsin System or in a technical college and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-10-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-10-04 | Senate | Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Lassa |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-05-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-04-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-04-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2011-04-01 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb53 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/SB53.pdf |