WI SB524 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 5.84 (1); and to create 5.84 (1) (b), 5.91 (19) and subchapter VI of chapter 6 [precedes 6.981] of the statutes; Relating to: using an electronic voting machine to cast a vote with an in-person absentee ballot. (FE)
Title
Using an electronic voting machine to cast a vote with an in-person absentee ballot. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Craig |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Craig |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections and Utilities |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb524 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB524.pdf |