WI SB522 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 66.0401 (1m) (intro.), (a), (b) and (c); to amend 196.378 (4g) (b); and to create 66.0401 (1m) (am), 196.38, 196.49 (5m) and 196.491 (3) (ds) of the statutes; Relating to: establishing solar field designations and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Establishing solar field designations and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Rep. Loren Oldenburg [R] | Rep. David Armstrong [R] | Rep. Lee Snodgrass [D] |
Rep. Deb Andraca [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. Samba Baldeh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-16 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities, Technology and Telecommunications |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Introduced |