WI SB522 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 969.035 (1), 969.08 (2), 969.08 (5) (a) 2., 969.08 (5) (a) 3., 969.08 (5) (b) 3., 969.08 (5) (b) 5. and 969.08 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: pretrial detention and denial and revocation of release. (FE)
Title
Pretrial detention and denial and revocation of release. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb522 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB522.pdf |