WI SB520 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to consolidate, renumber and amend 440.88 (9) (intro.) and (b); to amend 440.88 (9) (a), 448.13 (1) (a) 1., 455.065 (1) and 457.22 (1) (intro.); and to create 457.22 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring continuing education on suicide prevention for physicians, psychologists, social workers, marriage and family therapists, professional counselors, and substance abuse counselors and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Requiring continuing education on suicide prevention for physicians, psychologists, social workers, marriage and family therapists, professional counselors, and substance abuse counselors and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Representative Subeck withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Representative C. Taylor withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Representative Ramthun withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Representative Milroy withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2019-10-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2019-10-25 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb520 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB520.pdf |