WI SB515 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.192 (1) (am) and 238.137 of the statutes; Relating to: a regional revolving loan fund grant program administered by the Wisconsin Economic Development Corporation and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
A regional revolving loan fund grant program administered by the Wisconsin Economic Development Corporation and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Gudex [R] | Sen. Alberta Darling [R] | Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] |
Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Rep. John Nygren [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Warren Petryk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Commerce, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Commerce, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ringhand |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Lassa |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Gudex |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Commerce |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb515 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB515.pdf |