WI SB51 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Published 6-22-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Published 6-22-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 60.85 (3) (L), 60.85 (5) (c), 60.85 (6) (f) 3., 66.1105 (5) (be), 66.1105 (6m) (d) 3. and 66.1106 (10m) (c); and to amend 60.85 (5) (b), 60.85 (5) (d) 1., 60.85 (5) (f), 60.85 (6) (am), 60.85 (6) (f) 4., 60.85 (10) (b), 66.1105 (4) (gm) 4. bm., 66.1105 (5) (cm), 66.1105 (6) (ae), 66.1105 (6m) (d) 4., 66.1105 (8) (b), 66.1106 (7) (am), 66.1106 (7) (c) and 66.1106 (10m) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: technical changes to the tax incremental financing statutes. (FE)
Title
Technical changes to the tax incremental financing statutes. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] | Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Samantha Kerkman [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Published 6-22-2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 6-21-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 15 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 6-20-2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-05-10 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-10 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 97, Noes 0 |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-10 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-05-10 | House | Read a second time |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on calendar 5-10-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-05-04 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-04-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-03-08 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Ways and Means |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |