WI SB51 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-2-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-2-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 60.85 (6) (e) and 66.1105 (3) (g); to renumber and amend 66.1105 (6m) (c) and 66.1106 (10) (a); to amend 60.85 (4) (a) 1., 60.85 (8) (c) (intro.), 66.1105 (4m) (a) and 66.1106 (3) (a); and to create 60.85 (4) (d), 60.85 (6) (f), 60.85 (8) (c) 1. to 7., 66.1105 (4m) (f), 66.1105 (6m) (c) 1. to 7., 66.1105 (6m) (e), 66.1106 (3) (e), 66.1106 (10) (a) 1. to 7. and 66.1106 (10m) of the statutes; Relating to: standing joint review boards, annual joint review board meetings, annual reports on tax incremental districts, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Standing joint review boards, annual joint review board meetings, annual reports on tax incremental districts, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Published 3-2-2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-1-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 257 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-01-28 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2015-05-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read a third time |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from calendar 5-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Commerce, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Commerce, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Gudex |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Commerce |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced |