WI SB507 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 705.15 (1), 705.15 (2), 708.15 (3) (f) and 867.03 (2m) (a); to amend 705.15 (3), 705.15 (4), 708.15 (3) (d) (intro.) and 867.03 (1g) (intro.); and to create 705.15 (1b), 705.15 (1m) (a) to (e), 705.15 (2) (a) 2., 3. and 4., 705.15 (7), 705.15 (8), 708.15 (3) (f) 2., 867.03 (1p), 867.03 (2m) (a) 1. and 2. and 867.03 (2m) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: nonprobate transfers of real estate, the transfer by affidavit procedure for small estates, and the payoff amount in a mortgage payoff statement.
Title
Nonprobate transfers of real estate, the transfer by affidavit procedure for small estates, and the payoff amount in a mortgage payoff statement.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lasee [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Rob Summerfield [R] |
Rep. Terry Katsma [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Olsen |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2017-11-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2017-11-06 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb507 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB507.pdf |