WI SB504 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 48.23 (2); to amend 48.23 (2) (title); and to create 48.23 (2) (b) 2., 48.23 (2) (b) 3. and 48.23 (2) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: waiver of a parent's right to counsel in a contested adoption or an involuntary termination of parental rights proceeding for failure to personally appear as ordered by the juvenile court.
Title
Waiver of a parent's right to counsel in a contested adoption or an involuntary termination of parental rights proceeding for failure to personally appear as ordered by the juvenile court.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Lazich [R] | Rep. Patricia Strachota [R] | Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Rep. Gary Tauchen [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 337 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 57, Noes 38 |
2014-03-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 4 adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 4 offered by Senators Harris and Risser |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 3, Noes 1 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 4, Noes 0 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Harris |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Lazich |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Harris |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Labor |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Introduced |