WI SB500 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.467 (3) (c) and 15.467 (3) (d) of the statutes; relating to: appointments to the Council on Highway Safety.
Title
Appointments to the Council on Highway Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Senate | Published 4-19-2012 |
2012-04-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-6-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 245 |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-21-2012 |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-03-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-15 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2012-03-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-15 | House | Read a second time |
2012-03-13 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:24 A.M. on 3-14-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 24 |
2012-03-13 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-03-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 adopted |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended and taken up |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-13-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Transportation and Elections, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Transportation and Elections, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Lazich |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Elections |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |