WI SB5 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 5.051 of the statutes; Relating to: the suspension of a rule of the Elections Commission.
Title
The suspension of a rule of the Elections Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Referred to committee on Administrative Rules (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred to committee on Administrative Rules, Ayes 20, Noes 11 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Report without recommendation pursuant to s. 227.26 (2)(h), Wisconsin Statutes |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Joint Committee for Review of Administrative Rules report received pursuant to s. 227.26(2)(g), Wisconsin Statutes |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Administrative Rules |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Introduced |