WI SB499 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 979.01 (1r); to amend 979.01 (1) (intro.) and 979.01 (1g); and to create 16.009 (2) (q), 146.82 (2) (a) 8m., chapter 156 and 979.01 (1j) of the statutes; Relating to: permitting certain individuals to make requests for medication for the purpose of ending their lives and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting certain individuals to make requests for medication for the purpose of ending their lives and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2019-11-26SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-10-31SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-10-29SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-10-21SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-10-17SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-10-10SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-10-10SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback