WI SB498 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-14)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-14)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.40 (2r) (e) 2p. a. and 119.04 (1); and to create 20.255 (2) (du) and 115.366 of the statutes; Relating to: grants to support peer-to-peer suicide prevention programs in high schools, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants to support peer-to-peer suicide prevention programs in high schools, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-10-24 | Senate | LRB correction |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-18 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb498 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB498.pdf |