WI SB497 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 939.642 of the statutes; Relating to: using a drone to commit a crime and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Using a drone to commit a crime and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb497 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB497.pdf |