WI SB497 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 91.02 (2) (o) and 91.84 (2); to amend 91.84 (1) (a), 91.84 (4) and 91.84 (5); and to create 91.84 (1m) and 91.84 (2m) of the statutes; relating to: designation, modification, and termination of agricultural enterprise areas.
Title
Designation, modification, and termination of agricultural enterprise areas.
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Schultz [R] | Sen. Jim Holperin [D] | Rep. Lee Nerison [R] | Rep. Fred Clark [D] |
Rep. Amy Vruwink [D] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Travis Tranel [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Senate | Published 4-19-2012 |
2012-04-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-6-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 253 |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-21-2012 |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-03-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-13 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2012-03-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-13 | House | Read a second time |
2012-03-06 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:36 A.M. on 3-13-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 22 |
2012-03-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-03-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-6-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Report passage recommended by committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Higher Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Representative Spanbauer added as a cosponsor |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Higher Education |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |