WI SB496 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 938.396 (2g) (d); and to create 173.29, 938.3416, 941.292, 971.17 (1i) and 973.0336 of the statutes; relating to: possession of dogs by certain felony offenders and providing a penalty.
Title
Possession of dogs by certain felony offenders and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Sen. David Hansen [D] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Scott Suder [R] |
Rep. Annette Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-13 | Report of joint review committee on Criminal Penalties requested pursuant to s. 13.525 (5) Wisconsin Statutes | |
2010-02-22 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-12 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-10 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-01-25 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2010-01-25 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb496 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB496.pdf |