WI SB49 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Published 3-17-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Passed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Published 3-17-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.505 (1) (bg) and subchapter III of chapter 153 [precedes 153.85] of the statutes; Relating to: opioid and methamphetamine data system and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Opioid and methamphetamine data system and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 adopted (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 adopted (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Published 3-17-2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-16-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 181 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-15-2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-03-02 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 2) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 96, Noes 0 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:01 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 1 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted, Ayes 31, Noes 1 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-08 | Senate | LRB correction |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Testin |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced |