WI SB49 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Received from Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 944.30 (1m) (intro.) and 944.30 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: prosecuting a person under the age of 18 with committing an act of prostitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prosecuting a person under the age of 18 with committing an act of prostitution.

Sponsors

Sen. Alberta Darling [R]Sen. LaTonya Johnson [D]Sen. Patty Schachtner [D]Sen. Dan Feyen [R]
Sen. Lena Taylor [D]Sen. Timothy Carpenter [D]Sen. Janet Bewley [D]Sen. Jennifer Shilling [D]
Sen. Janis Ringhand [D]Sen. Robert Wirch [D]Sen. Jeff Smith [D]Sen. Fred Risser [D]
Sen. Robert Cowles [R]Sen. Andre Jacque [R]Sen. Luther Olsen [R]Sen. David Hansen [D]
Sen. Jon Erpenbach [D]Sen. Christopher Larson [D]Sen. Mark Miller [D]Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R]
Rep. Jill Billings [D]Rep. Jim Steineke [R]Rep. Jodi Emerson [D]Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R]
Rep. Joel Kitchens [R]Rep. Michael Rohrkaste [R]Rep. Gary Hebl [D]Rep. Debra Kolste [D]
Rep. Robert Kulp [R]Rep. Evan Goyke [D]Rep. Jocasta Zamarripa [D]Rep. Robyn Vining [D]
Rep. Katrina Shankland [D]Rep. Don Vruwink [D]Rep. Chris Taylor [D]Rep. Lisa Subeck [D]
Rep. Paul Tittl [R]Rep. Greta Neubauer [D]Rep. Steve Doyle [D]Rep. Melissa Sargent [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R]Rep. Jonathan Brostoff [D]Rep. Sondy Pope [D]Rep. Patrick Snyder [R]
Rep. John Spiros [R]Rep. David Crowley [D]Rep. Mary Felzkowski [R]Rep. Dave Considine [D]
Rep. Shelia Stubbs [D]Rep. Shannon Zimmerman [R]Rep. Treig Pronschinske [R]Rep. Beth Meyers [D]
Rep. Mark Spreitzer [D]Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R]Rep. Christine Sinicki [D]Rep. Jesse James [R]
Rep. Rick Gundrum [R]Rep. Robert Wittke [R]Rep. LaKeshia Myers [D]Rep. Tony Kurtz [R]
Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D]Rep. Shae Sortwell [R]Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R]Rep. Jimmy Anderson [D]
Rep. Scott Krug [R]Rep. David Murphy [R]Rep. Jason Fields [D]Rep. Warren Petryk [R]
Rep. Jim Ott [R]Rep. Staush Gruszynski [D]Rep. Daniel Riemer [D]Rep. David Steffen [R]
Rep. Ron Tusler [R]

Roll Calls

2019-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-06HouseReceived from Senate
2019-11-05SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-11-05SenateRead a third time and passed
2019-11-05SenateRules suspended
2019-11-05SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-11-05SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted, Ayes 19, Noes 14
2019-11-05SenateRead a second time
2019-11-05SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling
2019-11-05SenatePlaced on the foot of the 10th order of business on the calendar of 11-5-2019
2019-11-01SenatePlaced on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-09-25SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-09-25SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-09-25SenateExecutive action taken
2019-08-14SenatePublic hearing held
2019-05-14SenateRepresentative Murphy withdrawn as a cosponsor
2019-04-01SenateRepresentative Dittrich added as a cosponsor
2019-03-05SenateRepresentative Bowen added as a cosponsor
2019-02-27SenateRepresentative Cabrera added as a cosponsor
2019-02-25SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2019-02-25SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback