WI SB49 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.505 (4) (t), 20.505 (4) (tm), 20.505 (4) (tu) and 20.505 (4) (tw); to renumber 196.504 (1) (a); to renumber and amend 16.994 (2); to amend 16.994 (1) (intro.) and (a), 16.994 (3) (intro.), 20.155 (1) (q), 20.155 (3) (r), 20.255 (1) (q), 20.255 (3) (q), 20.255 (3) (qm), 20.255 (3) (r), 20.285 (1) (q), 20.505 (4) (s), 86.07 (2) (a), 118.40 (2r) (e) 2p. a., 196.218 (3) (a) 3. b., 196.218 (5) (a) 10., 196.504 (2) (a) and 196.504 (2) (c); to repeal and recreate 20.505 (4) (s) and 118.40 (2r) (e) 2p. a.; to create 16.994 (2) (b), 24.40 (3), 86.16 (6), 196.504 (1) (ab), 196.504 (1) (ad), 196.504 (1) (c) and 196.504 (2) (e) of the statutes; and to affect 2015 Wisconsin Act 55, section 800d and 2015 Wisconsin Act 55, section 9401 (1f); Relating to: the information technology block grant program, the broadband expansion grant program, waiving certain fees and appraisals, and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
The information technology block grant program, the broadband expansion grant program, waiving certain fees and appraisals, and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 15 laid on table (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 14 laid on table (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 13 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 12 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 11 laid on table (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 10 laid on table (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 9 laid on table (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 15 laid on table (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 14 laid on table (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 13 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 12 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 11 laid on table (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 10 laid on table (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 9 laid on table (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-22 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-05-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-04 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 15 laid on table, Ayes 20, Noes 13 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 14 laid on table, Ayes 20, Noes 13 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 13 adopted, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 12 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 11 laid on table, Ayes 20, Noes 13 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 10 laid on table, Ayes 20, Noes 13 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 9 laid on table, Ayes 20, Noes 13 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senator Cowles added as a coauthor |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 15 offered by Senators Vinehout, Johnson, C. Larson, L. Taylor, Hansen, Wirch, Bewley, Shilling, Risser, Ringhand, Erpenbach and Carpenter |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 14 offered by Senators Ringhand, Risser, Erpenbach, L. Taylor, Vinehout, Johnson, Hansen, Wirch, Bewley and Shilling |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 13 offered by Senators Shilling, Miller, Ringhand, Risser, Erpenbach, Carpenter, Vinehout, L. Taylor, Johnson, C. Larson, Hansen, Wirch and Bewley |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 12 offered by Senators Vinehout, Wirch, Bewley, Shilling, Miller, Ringhand, Risser and Erpenbach |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 11 offered by Senators Vinehout, Johnson, C. Larson, L. Taylor, Hansen, Wirch, Bewley, Shilling, Miller, Ringhand, Risser, Erpenbach and Carpenter |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 10 offered by Senators Vinehout, Johnson, C. Larson, L. Taylor, Hansen, Wirch, Bewley, Shilling, Miller, Ringhand, Risser, Carpenter and Erpenbach |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 9 offered by Senators Vinehout, Johnson, Hansen, Wirch, Bewley, Shilling, Miller, Ringhand, Risser and Erpenbach |
2017-04-04 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 1) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-4-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Report passage as amended, with emergency statement attached, pursuant to s.16.47 (2), Wisconsin Statutes, recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 8 by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 7 by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 6 by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 5 by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 4 by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Vinehout |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Ringhand |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced |