WI SB48 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Published 2-22-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Published 2-22-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 196.37 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: lead service line replacements. (FE)
Title
Lead service line replacements. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - House - Assembly: Refused to table Assembly Amendment 2 (Y: 31 N: 62 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-10-31 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - House - Assembly: Refused to table Assembly Amendment 2 (Y: 31 N: 62 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-10-31 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Published 2-22-2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 2-21-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 137 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-19-2018 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 2) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Assembly Amendment 2 concurred in |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 18, Noes 13 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Senators Risser, Miller, Carpenter, L. Taylor, Wirch, Ringhand, Shilling, Erpenbach, Larson, Johnson and Hansen |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-11-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-09 | House | Representative Rohrkaste added as a cosponsor |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2017-11-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2017-11-09 | House | Refused to table Assembly Amendment 2, Ayes 31, Noes 62 |
2017-11-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a second time |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-11-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Thiesfeldt and Petersen |
2017-11-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Petersen |
2017-11-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-10-31 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-10-30 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Cowles |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-31-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Representative Young added as a cosponsor |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Representative Pope added as a cosponsor |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Representative Riemer added as a cosponsor |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Representative Bernier added as a cosponsor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Representative Billings added as a cosponsor |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Cowles |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Representative Berceau added as a cosponsor |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senator Wirch added as a coauthor |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced |