WI SB478 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 346.70 (title), 346.70 (1), 346.70 (3) and 346.74 (2); and to create 343.32 (2) (bk), 346.70 (1m), 346.74 (2g) and 346.74 (2r) of the statutes; relating to: giving notice of, and providing assistance after, a motor vehicle accident and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Giving notice of, and providing assistance after, a motor vehicle accident and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Senate | Published 4-19-2012 |
2012-04-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-6-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 256 |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-26-2012 |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-03-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-15 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2012-03-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-15 | House | Read a second time |
2012-03-13 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:20 A.M. on 3-14-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 24 |
2012-03-13 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-03-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 adopted |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended and taken up |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-13-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator S. Fitzgerald |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-02-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Utilities, Commerce, and Government Operations |
2012-02-15 | Senate | Introduced |