WI SB477 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Published 5-5-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Published 5-5-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 62.63 (5) of the statutes; relating to: treatment of abandoned employee retirement accounts under a retirement system of a 1st class city.
Title
Treatment of abandoned employee retirement accounts under a retirement system of a 1st class city.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Published 5-5-2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Report approved by the Governor on 4-21-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 191 | |
2010-04-20 | Presented to the Governor on 4-20-2010 | |
2010-04-16 | Report correctly enrolled on 4-16-2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-13 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-13 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-13 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-13 | Rules suspended and taken up | |
2010-04-13 | Read | |
2010-04-13 | Received from Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-13 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-04-13 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-13 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on calendar 4-13-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-03-03 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-03-03 | Withdrawn from joint survey committee on Retirement Systems and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 46 (2)(c) | |
2010-02-23 | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and referred to committee on Retirement Systems, pursuant to Senate Rule 46 (2)(c) | |
2010-02-18 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-02-18 | Report passage recommended by committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-18 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-10 | Public hearing held | |
2010-01-25 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-01-25 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-01-22 | Read first time and referred to committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations | |
2010-01-22 | Introduced |