WI SB473 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 196.378 (3) (a) 1m., 196.49 (1) (am), 196.50 (1) (a) and 196.81 (3) (b); and to create 196.50 (1) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: renewable resource credits, removal of certain natural gas service laterals, natural gas public utility service in municipalities, and granting rule-making authority.
Title
Renewable resource credits, removal of certain natural gas service laterals, natural gas public utility service in municipalities, and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb473 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB473.pdf |