WI SB472 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 15.137 (7), 20.235 (1) (em), 39.52, 71.05 (6) (a) 30. and 71.05 (6) (b) 54. of the statutes; Relating to: creating a program for reimbursing the higher education debt of beginning farmers, creating an individual income tax deduction for certain amounts received from such a program, granting rule-making authority, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Creating a program for reimbursing the higher education debt of beginning farmers, creating an individual income tax deduction for certain amounts received from such a program, granting rule-making authority, making an appropriation, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-11 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb472 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB472.pdf |