WI SB464 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 440.03 (13) (b) (intro.); and to create 440.15 of the statutes; relating to: prohibiting fingerprinting in connection with professional credentials issued by the Department of Safety and Professional Services or an examining board or affiliated credentialing board, except as provided in the statutes, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.
Title
Prohibiting fingerprinting in connection with professional credentials issued by the Department of Safety and Professional Services or an examining board or affiliated credentialing board, except as provided in the statutes, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Galloway [R] | Rep. Erik Severson [R] | Rep. Michelle Litjens [R] | Rep. Jim Steineke [R] |
Rep. Richard Spanbauer [R] | Rep. Chad Weininger [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 68 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Senate | Published 4-19-2012 |
2012-04-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-6-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 255 |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-21-2012 |
2012-03-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-03-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-15 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 68, Noes 26, Paired 2 |
2012-03-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-15 | House | Read a second time |
2012-03-06 | House | Made a special order of business at 12:06 P.M. on 3-13-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 22 |
2012-03-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-03-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 17, Noes 16 |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-6-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Report passage recommended by committee on Labor, Public Safety, and Urban Affairs, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor, Public Safety, and Urban Affairs |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Introduced |