WI SB462 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 218.0116 (1) (n); and to create 218.0101 (9m), 218.0116 (1) (w) 3. and 218.0121 (3m) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: ownership, control, or operation of a motor vehicle dealership and performance of motor vehicle warranty service. (FE)
Title
Ownership, control, or operation of a motor vehicle dealership and performance of motor vehicle warranty service. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Senator Bernier withdrawn as a coauthor |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kooyenga |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Representatives Drake and Stubbs added as cosponsors |
2021-09-17 | Senate | Representative Cabral-Guevara withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Representative Hong added as a cosponsor |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Introduced |