WI SB462 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 100.54 (2) (a) 3., 100.54 (4) (a) 4., 100.54 (6) (a) 3., 100.54 (9) (b), 100.545 (3) (a) 4., 100.545 (4) (a) 3., 100.545 (5) (b) and 100.545 (5) (c); to renumber and amend 100.54 (9) (a) and 100.545 (5) (a); and to amend 100.54 (2) (b) (intro.), 100.54 (4) (b), 100.54 (6) (b), 100.54 (9) (title), 100.54 (11) and 100.545 (5) (title) of the statutes; Relating to: fees related to security freezes on consumer credit reports.
Title
Fees related to security freezes on consumer credit reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Senators L. Taylor and Carpenter added as coauthors |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin |
2017-10-20 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a coauthor |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb462 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB462.pdf |