WI SB460 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 25.182; and to create 25.17 (14m) (d) and 25.183 (4) and (5) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting the Investment Board from making certain investments relating to China and Iran. (FE)
Title
Prohibiting the Investment Board from making certain investments relating to China and Iran. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Rep. David Armstrong [R] | Rep. Samba Baldeh [D] |
Rep. Janel Brandtjen [R] | Rep. Rick Gundrum [R] | Rep. Donna Rozar [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Introduced |