WI SB460 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 978.001 (1p) and 978.11; to amend 13.093 (2) (a), 230.33 (1), 978.03, 978.045 (1g), 978.045 (1r) (bm) (intro.), 978.045 (2), 978.05 (9) and 978.12 (1) (c); and to create 13.0967, 15.105 (7), 15.77, 20.548, 20.923 (4) (f) 7x., 20.923 (6) (hs), 230.08 (2) (qp), 978.001 (1b), (1d) and (1n), 978.003, 978.004 and 978.005 of the statutes; Relating to: creation of a prosecutor board and a state prosecutors office and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creation of a prosecutor board and a state prosecutors office and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Senator Jacque added as a coauthor |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Government Oversight and Courts |
2019-09-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb460 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB460.pdf |