WI SB46 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.455 (2) (hd) and 48.48 (19); and to create 20.437 (1) (hf), 814.75 (28), 814.76 (21), 944.35 and 973.05 (2m) (fr) of the statutes; Relating to: prostitution crime surcharge and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Prostitution crime surcharge and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives B. Meyers, Stuck, Doyle, Spreitzer, Considine, Subeck, Sinicki, Ohnstad, Pope, Hebl, Shankland, Billings, Kolste and Brostoff |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:25 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2019-06-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduced |