WI SB46 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 253.155 and 948.215 of the statutes; Relating to: causing harm to a child by cosleeping while intoxicated, providing information about safe sleep, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Causing harm to a child by cosleeping while intoxicated, providing information about safe sleep, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling |
2015-03-25 | Senate | LRB correction |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb46 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB46.pdf |