WI SB46 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 125.07 (3) (a) 15., 125.07 (4) (bg) and 125.07 (4) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: alcohol beverages violations involving underage persons on licensed premises.
Title
Alcohol beverages violations involving underage persons on licensed premises.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-08-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Judiciary and Labor and rereferred to committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Labor |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb46 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB46.pdf |