WI SB459 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Published 4-27-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Published 4-27-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 30.025 (5) and 30.12 (3) (a) 6. a., b. and c.; to renumber and amend 30.12 (3) (a) 6. (intro.), 30.121 (3w) (c) and 281.36 (3n) (a); to amend 30.01 (1am) (c), 30.01 (1d), 30.12 (1k) (f), 30.12 (3) (a) 3c., 30.12 (3) (a) 3g., 30.12 (3) (a) 3r., 30.12 (3) (a) 13., 30.12 (3) (c), 30.121 (1), 30.121 (3c), 30.133 (1), 30.19 (1b) (a), 30.19 (1g) (a), 30.19 (1g) (am), 30.206 (1) (a), 30.29 (3) (d), 31.02 (1), 31.185 (5) and 281.36 (4) (d); and to create 23.24 (4) (b) 4., 30.025 (6), 30.053, 30.106, 30.115, 30.12 (1g) (am), 30.12 (3m) (cr), 30.121 (3b), 30.121 (3w) (c) 3., 30.125, 30.19 (1m) (dm), 30.20 (1g) (b) 3., 30.20 (1t) (b), 30.20 (1t) (c), 30.20 (2) (cn), 281.16 (2) (c), 281.31 (2) (b), 281.36 (3n) (a) 4. and 281.36 (4) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: the regulation of navigable waters and wetlands. (FE)
Title
The regulation of navigable waters and wetlands. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lasee [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Sen. Devin LeMahieu [R] | Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] |
Sen. Chris Kapenga [R] | Rep. Adam Jarchow [R] | Rep. John Nygren [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] |
Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Sen. Rob Hutton [R] | Sen. David Craig [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] |
Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] | Rep. Kevin Petersen [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Senate Substitute Amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Published 4-27-2016 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-26-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 387 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-21-2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 56, Noes 37, Paired 4 |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:27 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-16 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 3 adopted |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 4 offered by Senator Hansen |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 3 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Senator Cowles |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senator Lasee |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Lasee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Introduced |