WI SB458 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 753.0605 of the statutes; Relating to: adding 12 circuit court branches to be allocated by the director of state courts. (FE)
Title
Adding 12 circuit court branches to be allocated by the director of state courts. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senator Jacque added as a coauthor |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-10-01 | Senate | Representative Murphy added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2019-09-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb458 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB458.pdf |