WI SB458 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-2-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-2-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 101.63 (7); to amend 20.165 (2) (j); and to create 101.63 (7) (b) and 101.652 of the statutes; Relating to: information required on building permit forms and reporting requirements for municipalities that issue building permits. (FE)
Title
Information required on building permit forms and reporting requirements for municipalities that issue building permits. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Sen. John Jagler [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] |
Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Published 3-2-2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-1-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 211 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2016-02-16 | House | Read |
2016-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-25 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 1) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections and Local Government |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Introduced |