WI SB457 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 285.30 (5) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: exempting motor vehicles that are at least 10 model years old from emissions testing.
Title
Exempting motor vehicles that are at least 10 model years old from emissions testing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb457 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB457.pdf |