WI SB455 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-04 - Published 12-1-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-04 - Published 12-1-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 452.01 (2) (h) and 452.137 (1) (c); to renumber and amend 452.06 (1), 452.137 (1) (a), 452.137 (2) (a) (intro.), 452.137 (2) (a) 1. and 452.137 (2) (a) 2.; to amend 452.01 (2) (a), 452.01 (5m) (a), 452.05 (1) (b), 452.133 (title), 452.134 (1) (a), 452.137 (2) (c), 452.137 (4) (a), 452.137 (4) (b) (intro.) and 452.25 (1) (a); to repeal and recreate 452.14 (3) (p); and to create 452.01 (2) (d), 452.01 (5e), 452.06 (1) (c), 452.07 (3), 452.133 (3) (d), 452.136, 452.137 (1) (am), 452.137 (1) (cm), 452.137 (1) (e), 452.137 (2) (am), 452.137 (2) (b) 3., 452.137 (2) (bm), 452.137 (4) (c) and 452.25 (1) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: various changes regarding the laws governing real estate practice and the licensure of real estate brokers and salespersons and granting rule-making authority.
Title
Various changes regarding the laws governing real estate practice and the licensure of real estate brokers and salespersons and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lasee [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Rep. Bob Gannon [R] | Sen. John Jagler [R] |
Rep. Robert Brooks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-04 | Senate | Published 12-1-2017 |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-30-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 110 |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-28-2017 |
2017-11-10 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-07 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2017-11-07 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2017-11-02 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-11-01 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-10-31 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-31-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-10-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-10-20 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Housing and Trade, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-10-20 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-10-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Housing and Trade |
2017-10-13 | Senate | Introduced |