WI SB455 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-05 - Published 3-17-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-05 - Published 3-17-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 450.01 (23) (k) of the statutes; relating to: the wholesale distribution of prescription drugs.
Title
The wholesale distribution of prescription drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-05 | Published 3-17-2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Report approved by the Governor on 3-3-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 142 | |
2010-03-02 | Presented to the Governor on 3-2-2010 | |
2010-02-18 | Report correctly enrolled on 2-18-2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Received from Assembly concurred in | |
2010-02-16 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-02-16 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended | |
2010-02-16 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-02-16 | Read a second time | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended and taken up | |
2010-02-16 | Read | |
2010-02-16 | Received from Senate | |
2010-02-16 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-02-16 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-02-16 | Rules suspended | |
2010-02-16 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-02-16 | Senate amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-02-16 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senators Robson and Sullivan | |
2010-02-16 | Read a second time | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on calendar 2-16-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-02-02 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-02-02 | Report passage recommended by committee on Public Health, Senior Issues, Long-Term Care, and Job Creation, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-01-28 | Executive action taken | |
2010-01-27 | Public hearing held | |
2010-01-12 | Read first time and referred to committee on Public Health, Senior Issues, Long-Term Care, and Job Creation | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced |