WI SB452 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 49.46 (2) (a) 4. (intro.), 49.46 (2) (b) 6. (intro.) and 49.46 (2) (b) 6. g. of the statutes; Relating to: requirements for certain services covered under the Medical Assistance program. (FE)
Title
Requirements for certain services covered under the Medical Assistance program. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Leah Vukmir [R] | Rep. John Nygren [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Senator Moulton added as a coauthor |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb452 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB452.pdf |